Brazill v. Cowart et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel R. Brazill
Defendant: Beth E. Cowart, Ronald L. Holmes, Celiste Kemp, T. Williams-Harris, Skipper H. Powell and Roger D. McCracken
Case Number: 2:2010cv00458
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Presiding Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OPINION AND ORDER denying 71 Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/14/2013. (RKR)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER denying 25 Motion to dismiss. Defendant Coward shall file an Answer and Affirmative Defenses within 21 days. The Court sua sponte dismisses Holmes pursuant to § 1915A. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly as to Holmes and correct the caption of the case. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/8/2012. (RKR)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL dismissing without prejudice defendants Powell, McCracken, Kemp, and Harris from 1 Complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing these defendants and edit the docket to reflect their dismissal. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/14/2011. (RKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brazill v. Cowart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel R. Brazill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth E. Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celiste Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Williams-Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skipper H. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger D. McCracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?