Carroll-Brufsky et al v. The E.W. Scripps Company et al
Plaintiff: Allen D. Brufsky and Marcia Carroll-Brufsky
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and The E.W. Scripps Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv00500
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Collier
Presiding Judge: Charlene E. Honeywell
Presiding Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying without prejudice 60 Motion to enforce settlement, for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 6/19/2013. (JM)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend 40 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint within 14 days. The Clerk shall docket said complaint upon receipt of same. Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike 37 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/14/2012. (LN)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Defendant E.W. Scripps Company's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint, Motion to Strike, and Supporting Memorandum of Law 33 is GRANTED as stated herein. Plaintiffs' defamation claim against Scripps is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiffs to amend this claim within 20 days. Plaintiffs' claims for punitive damages and attorneys' fees are stricken from the Third Amended Complaint with respect to their application to Scripps. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/9/2012. (LN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll-Brufsky et al v. The E.W. Scripps Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The E.W. Scripps Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen D. Brufsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Carroll-Brufsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?