April 3, 2014 |
Filing
68
ORDER granting 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Schedule Foreclosure Sale. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 4/3/2014. (BLW)
|
January 3, 2014 |
Filing
61
ORDER dismissing case re 59 Notice (Other). Count III of Plaintiff's Verified Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the Stipulated Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Count III of the Amended Verified Complaint as to Parker Commons Office Park Condominium Association Inc. 59 , with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Judgment is further entered in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant Parker Commons as to Count II of the Amended Verifie d Complaint pursuant to this Court's Order at Doc. 57 This matter against Defendant Unknown Occupants is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs pursuant to this Court's Order at Doc. 54 The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the judgment that was previously entered at Doc. 51 accordingly, terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/3/2014. (LMF)
|
December 31, 2013 |
Filing
58
ORDER re 56 Notice (Other) filed by PNC Bank, N.A. Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 3, 2014, to submit a stipulation of dismissal of Count III against Parker Commons. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/31/2013. (LMF)
|
December 16, 2013 |
Filing
54
ORDER re 52 Notice (Other) filed by PNC Bank, N.A. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to PNC Bank's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Unknown Occupants 52 , with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk shall withhold the entry of judgment until the conclusion of this case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/16/2013. (LMF)
|
December 2, 2013 |
Filing
50
ORDER granting 48 PNC Bank N.A.'s Motion for Entry of Final Judgment as to Defendants DBAK Holdings LLC and Unknown Occupants, n/k/a U.S. Health Advisors. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant DBAK Holdings LL C as to Counts I, II, and III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in the amount of $259,999.80, plus pre-judgment interest from October 25, 2013, through the entry of judgment, and post-judgment interest thereafter accruing at the daily rate o f $46.85. The judgment shall also include an amount of $20,310.50 in attorney's fees and $2,394.21 in costs. The Clerk shall further enter judgment in favor of the Plaintiff against Defendant Unknown Occupants, n/k/a U.S. Health Advisors as to Count II of the Amended Complaint, Foreclosure of Real Property. Defendant DBAK Holdings is further directed to complete a Florida Rules of Civil Procedure, Form 1.977, Fact Information Sheet, including all required attachments, withi n 45 days of the entry of Judgment in this matter. Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 13, 2013, to move for a consent judgment or default against Defendant Parker Commons and inform the Court the status of the remaining Unknown Defendants. The Clerk of the Court shall provide a copy of this Order to the Defendants at the last known addresses in the Court file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/2/2013. (LMF)
|
October 18, 2013 |
Filing
46
ORDER granting 45 Plaintiff's Application for Clerk's Default Against the Unknown Occupants. The Clerk is directed to correct the caption of the case to ADD "Unknown Occupants n/k/a U.S. Health Advisors" as a defendant. The Clerk is thereafter directed to enter clerk's default against "Unknown Occupants n/k/a U.S. Health Advisors" ONLY. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/18/2013. (LMF)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing
43
ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk is directed to enter a Clerk's Default against Defendant DBAK Holdings, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/27/2013. (LMF)
|
May 15, 2013 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting 18 The Plaintiff, PNC Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to enter a Clerk's Default against the Defendant DBAK Holdings, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/15/2013. (LMF)
|