Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 2:2013cv00259
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Order dismissing case. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/20/2014. (LMF)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing case re 13 Notice of settlement. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to the Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of John Doe 13 . The Clerk is directed to terminate any previously scheduled deadlines and pending motions and CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/16/2013. (LMF)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 4 the Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/17/2013. (LMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: M. Keith Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?