Cheeburger Cheeburger Restaurants, Inc. v. 4JZINK, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Cheeburger Cheeburger Restaurants, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Michael Halama, Joseph L. Schafer, Eugene H. Rees, 4JZINK, LLC and David R. Halama |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00558 |
Filed: |
July 29, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Ft. Myers Office |
County: |
Lee |
Presiding Judge: |
Sheri Polster Chappell |
Presiding Judge: |
Douglas N. Frazier |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Franchise |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 6, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER dismissing case re 40 Stipulation of Dismissal.This matter is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Plaintiff and Defendants Joseph L. Shafer, Michael Halama, David R. Halama, and 4JZink, LLC's Joint Stipulation of Dismissal [ 40] and pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Eugene H. Rees, Jr. 41 , with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly, terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/6/2013. (LMF)
|
October 8, 2013 |
Filing
37
ORDER re 36 Notice of settlement filed by Michael Halama, David R. Halama, Joseph L. Schafer. That this cause between Plaintiff and Defendants Joseph L. Schafer, Michael Halama, and David Halama is DISMISSED without prejudice subject to the rig ht of any party within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, November 8, 2013, to submit a stipulated form of final judgment or to reopen the action upon a showing of good cause. See Local Rule 3.08(b). Otherwise, after thirty (30) days, with out further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. All pending deadlines between Plaintiff and Defendants Joseph L. Schafer, Michael Halama, and David Halama are hereby moot. Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 15, 2013, to inform the Court whether it will be pursing this action against Defendants 4JZINK, LLC and Eugene H. Rees. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/8/2013. (LMF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?