Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Bayer et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Joel S. Bayer, Irwin J. Blitt, Jack N. Fingersh and Ronald R. Rucker
Case Number: 2:2013cv00752
Filed: October 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Collier
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Presiding Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Strike as set forth therein. Defendants may file amended affirmative defenses within 14 days of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/18/2015. (RKR)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of June 27, 2014 Opinion and Order and Alternative Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. The motion is granted as to the request for reconsideration. Having reconsidered the matter, the Court reaches the same conclusions as set forth in the Opinion and Order filed on June 27, 2014. The motion is otherwise denied. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/19/2014. (MAB)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION AND ORDER denying 16 Defendant Ronald R. Rucker's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part 18 Defendants Joel Bayer, Irwin Blitt, and Jack Fingersh's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Joint and Several Liability Claims. The last full sentence of paragraph 74, and all of paragraph 91 are stricken from the Complaint. The motion is otherwise denied. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/27/2014. (MAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Bayer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Joseph G. Galardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel S. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin J. Blitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack N. Fingersh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald R. Rucker
Represented By: Charles J. Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?