Bauer v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Martha Bauer
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2013cv00850
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 60 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesOrder on Motion for SanctionsOrder on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/20/2015. (LMF)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying as moot 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Stay. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/2/2014. (LMF)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing case re 1 Complaint. Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that properly alleges this Court's subject matter jurisdiction no later than December 21, 2013. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the case being dismissed without further notice for failure to allege this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/11/2013. (LMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Bauer
Represented By: Bill B. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?