The Provident Bank v. Gulf Coast Charters, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Provident Bank
Defendant: Gulf Coast Charters, LLC and Robert W. Brown
Case Number: 2:2013cv00872
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31301
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER dismissing case re 53 Order dismissing case. The Clerk is directed to dismiss this case with prejudice, enter judgment in accordance with the parties' stipulation, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/23/2015. (LMF)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 39 Notice (Other) filed by The Provident Bank. This matter is referred to the Honorable Carol Mirando to conduct a settlement conference and issue any order deemed appropriate thereafter. The parties are directed to contact Judge Mirando's chambers to arrange for a mutually agreeable time to conduct the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/6/2014. (LMF)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 29 The Provident Bank's Motion for Final Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/4/2014. (LMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Provident Bank v. Gulf Coast Charters, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Provident Bank
Represented By: Adam B. Cooke
Represented By: Robert D. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Charters, LLC
Represented By: Jack C. Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Brown
Represented By: Jack C. Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?