Vasquez et al v. Marques et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Salazar Vasquez, Porfirio Aguilar Fabian, Ernesto Aguilar Bocanegra, Macodonio Ambrocio Matias, Filiberto Bautista, Josue Carrillo Ortiz, Agustin Cristen Tejeda, Luis Alberto Cruz Vasquez, Pedro Cruz Vasquez, Jose Alberto Garcia Rodriguez, Esteban Gonzalez Marques, Gustavo Gonzalez Martinez, Fernando Gonzalez Perez, Isaac Gonzalez Trejo, Feliciano Lopez Cruz, Miguel Macias DeLuna, Rene Martinez Martinez, Antonio Mendez Garcia, Marcos Marquez Mar, Bonifacio Marquez Marquez, Roberto Carlos Marquez, Claudio Serafin Martinez, Giovanni Serafin Martinez, Francisco Osario Del Angel, Saul Perez Mendez, Francisco Bruno Perianez, Jose Ramos Ramos, Candido Ramirez Ortega, Felipe Reyes Salvador, Bertin Rojas Lopez, Meliton Salazar Rodriguez, Uziel Santiago Martinez, Javier Vasquez Hernandez and Ricardo Vite Xothihua
Defendant: P & L Harvesting, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00161
Filed: March 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER granting 46 Joint Amended Motion for approval of amended settlement agreement and release and for dismissal with the exception of the request to retain jurisdiction; adopting and incorporating 47 Report and Recommendations; approving Amended Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims. The Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing the case with prejudice, terminate all deadlines and motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/3/2015. (RKR)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying without prejudice 44 The parties' Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Release and for Dismissal with Prejudice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. The parties shall have up to and including July 7, 2015 to file an amended joint motion in compliance with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 6/23/2015. (ANW)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 34 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Mediation Deadline as Set Forth in the Case Management Report. The mediation deadline is extended to April 29, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 1/13/2015. (BLW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez et al v. Marques et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Salazar Vasquez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porfirio Aguilar Fabian
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Aguilar Bocanegra
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macodonio Ambrocio Matias
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filiberto Bautista
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Carrillo Ortiz
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Cristen Tejeda
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Cruz Vasquez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Cruz Vasquez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alberto Garcia Rodriguez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Gonzalez Marques
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Gonzalez Martinez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Gonzalez Perez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Gonzalez Trejo
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feliciano Lopez Cruz
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Macias DeLuna
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Martinez Martinez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Mendez Garcia
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Marquez Mar
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonifacio Marquez Marquez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Carlos Marquez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudio Serafin Martinez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Serafin Martinez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Osario Del Angel
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Perez Mendez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Bruno Perianez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ramos Ramos
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candido Ramirez Ortega
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Reyes Salvador
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertin Rojas Lopez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meliton Salazar Rodriguez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uziel Santiago Martinez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Vasquez Hernandez
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Vite Xothihua
Represented By: Amanda Marie Caldwell
Represented By: Gladys Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P & L Harvesting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?