January 18, 2018 |
Filing
164
OPINION AND ORDER granting 147 defendants P. Perrino and D. LaPaugh's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and against plaintiff as to Counts I, II, III, and IV, terminate all pending motions and deadlines, and close the file. See Opinion and Order for details. (AMB)
|
October 30, 2017 |
Filing
146
ORDER denying 144 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, construed as a Motion for Reconsideration of the Order (Doc. 143 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 10/30/2017. (HJ)
|
October 5, 2017 |
Filing
143
ORDER denying 127 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 131 Plaintiff's Rule 45 Motion to Compel; denying 134 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting 138 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Cost Shifting. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Response for Motion to Compel (Doc. 137) is STRICKEN. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 10/5/2017. (HJ)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing
115
ORDER denying 99 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel per Rule 26(c)(2); denying 104 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel per Rule 37; denying 107 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery from Non-Party under Rule 45; denying 108 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery per Rule 34. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 2/22/2017. (HJ)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing
106
ORDER denying 94 Plaintiff's Request for Deposition of Third Party; denying 97 Plaintiff's Injunctive/Declaratory Relief; taking under advisement 99 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel per Rule 26(c)(2); denying 101 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Defendants shall have up to and including February 15, 2017 to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel per Rule 26(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 2/7/2017. (HJ)
|
December 30, 2016 |
Filing
93
ORDER denying 85 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel - Rule 26; granting 87 Plaintiff's Motion for Document; denying 88 Plaintiff's Motion for Extended Interrogatories. A Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of the Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 35) to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 12/30/2016. (HJ)
|
December 1, 2016 |
Filing
82
ORDER granting 80 Plaintiff's Motion for Documents. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of the Orders (Docs. 34, 46) to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 12/1/2016. (HJ)
|
November 8, 2016 |
Filing
75
ORDER denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Notify Court; denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Request Disclosure without Serving; denying 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Declaratory, Injunctive Relief Permitting Third Party Pres ence; granting 66 Plaintiff's Request for Documents; denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail copies of the Court's Order entered on April 6, 2016, the Complaint (Doc. 1), and the Amended Complaint (Doc. 6) to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/8/2016. (HJ)
|
August 4, 2016 |
Filing
46
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint within fourteen days of this Opinion and Order. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/4/2016. (AMB)
|
July 8, 2016 |
Filing
45
ORDER denying without prejudice 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel ; granting 44 Defendants' Motion for Stay of Discovery and Enlargement of Time to File Case Management Report and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Discovery is stayed for 30 days until August 8, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 7/8/2016. (ANW)
|
February 2, 2016 |
Filing
39
ORDER granting 37 Defendants' Motion for Stay of Discovery and Enlargement of Time to File Case Management Report. Discovery is STAYED for sixty (60) days until April 2, 2016. Within ten (10) days after the expiration of the sixty (60) day period, if this matter is not resolved by the dispositive motion or the Court has not yet ruled on the motion, the parties are directed to file their Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 2/2/2016. (ANW)
|
December 4, 2015 |
Filing
34
ORDER granting without prejudice 23 defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a Third Amended Complaint within fourteen days of this Opinion and Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/4/2015. (AMB)
|
September 4, 2015 |
Filing
29
ORDER denying 24 Motion to appoint counsel; denying without prejudice 26 Motion to Compel; denying 27 Motion to appoint counsel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 9/4/2015. (ALB)
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to Amend Complaint, construed as a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint; finding as moot 14 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 13, 2015 during which to file a second amended complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 7/15/2015. (ALB)
|