Bellamy v. Palack et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bellamy
Defendant: First Class Management LLC and Tara P. Paluck
Case Number: 2:2015cv00431
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and defendant is dismissed with prejudice; denying as moot 45 Motion for summary judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff, terminate all pending motions and deadlines as moot, and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/4/2017. (RKR)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION AND ORDER adopting and incorporating 21 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint against First Class Management LLC only within 14 days of this Opinion and Order. If no Second Amended Complaint is filed, the Court will close the case without further notice. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/1/2016. (RKR)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part 15 Report and Recommendations; recommitting 13 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis for a frivolity review under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B); overruling 18 Objections. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/17/2016. (RKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellamy v. Palack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bellamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Class Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara P. Paluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?