Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Plaintiff: Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Defendant: Gone Country Motor Sports, Inc., Timothy Lloyd, Scott Kirk, Marlayna Gomez and Jared O'Keefe
Case Number: 2:2015cv00669
Filed: October 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER dismissing case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed, without prejudice, the Court reserving jurisdiction for sixty (60) days to permit any party to move to reopen the action, for good cause shown, or to submit and file a stipulated form of final judgment. Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 12/23/2016. (LMF)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 75 the Joint Motion to Dispense with Mediation. The parties shall have up to and including January 2, 2017 to participate in a mediation conference. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 10/6/2016. (HJ)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Gone Country Motor Sports, Inc. Plaintiff Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London' suit as against Defendant Gone Country Motor Sports is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/17/2016. (LMF)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Plaintiffs' Motion to Entry of Default Against Defendant Gone Country Motor Sports, Inc. d/b/a Redneck Yacht Club. The Clerk is directed to enter a Clerk's Default against Defendant Gone Country Motor Sports, Inc. d/b/a Redneck Yacht Club. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 6/15/2016. (ANW)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 61 Response to order to show cause filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. The Court will take no further action on its Order dated March 21, 2016 54 . If Defendant Gone Country Motor Sports, Inc. has not filed an answer or otherwise defended against this action on or before April 18, 2016, Plaintiff shall advise the Court as to how it wishes to proceed on or before April 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/29/2016. (LMF)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 50 Stipulation filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Pursuant to Plaintiff and Defendant O'Keefe's Stipulation 50 filed with this Court and is incorporated herein, Defendant O'Keefe has agree d to be bound by the final judgment in this action for declaratory judgment and/or reformation. This case shall be ABATED with respect to claims between Plaintiff and Defendant O'Keefe only. Neither Plaintiff nor Defendant O'Keefe shall be required to file further pleadings or participate in discovery through the conclusion of this case as between themselves only. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/17/2016. (LMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Patrick Edward Betar
Represented By: Michelle Blum
Represented By: Adam Bunge
Represented By: Melissa McMillan Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gone Country Motor Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lloyd
Represented By: Andrew William Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlayna Gomez
Represented By: Royce Clement Haddad, Jr.
Represented By: Gary J. Takacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?