Allen Systems Group, Inc. v. Avon Products, Inc.

Plaintiff: Allen Systems Group, Inc.
Defendant: Avon Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00121
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Collier
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R. McCoy
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 170 ORDER re 131 Opinion and order. Having reviewed the summary judgment Order, the Court finds all factual findings except paragraph four are accurate and can be entered as pretrial stipulations in the jury instructions for trial. However, par agraph four is inaccurate. The Court found Avon violated the 2006 Software License Agreement with regard to four products: ASG-Zeke, ASG-Job/Scan, ASG-TMON and ASG-ViewDirect. (Doc. 131 at 21-23). By contrast, paragraph four of the Amended Fina l Pretrial Statement states Avon violated the 2006 software license agreement with ASG-Zeke, ASG-Job/Scan, ASG-TMON, and ASG-DocumentDirect. (Doc. 155 at 14-15). Neither the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint nor the Court's summary judgment h olding discusses ASG-DocumentDirect. (Docs. 37 ; 131 ). Thus, paragraph four may only be included in the stipulations if it inserts ASG-ViewDirect in place of ASG-DocumentDirect. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/4/2018. (LMF)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 162 ORDER granting 161 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Seal and Incorporated Supporting Memorandum of Law. Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 30, 2018 to file under seal its excerpts from the deposition testimony of Christine Addonizio, Robert Nelson, Mark Farrell, Cheryl Watson Walker, Charles Wilson, Michael Leach, and Dilip Upmanyu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 3/27/2018. (DRS)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 160 ORDER granting 159 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal. Defendant shall have up to and including March 26, 2018 to file under the seal its unredacted response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine and exhibits to the accompanying declaration of Benjamin Gruenstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 3/23/2018. (HJ)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 151 ORDER granting 142 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Seal and Incorporated Supporting Memorandum of Law; granting 148 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 3/20/2018. (HJ)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 132 ORDER re 130 Notice (Other) filed by Allen Systems Group, Inc. The Court GRANTS the parties' request to appear telephonically at their meeting to prepare a joint final pretrial statement. 130 . The Court will enter a Third Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order under separate cover. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/13/2018. (LMF)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 125 ORDER re 117 SEALED MOTION amended motion for partial summary judgment by Allen Systems Group, Inc. filed by Allen Systems Group, Inc. ASG must file a reply brief, not to exceed five (5) pages in length, on or before October 19, 2017, concerning its argument that Avon improperly used ASG software for the benefit of New Avon LLC. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/12/2017. (LMF)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 124 ORDER. The trial term in the above-captioned case is set for February 2018, and all of the remaining pretrial deadlines are suspended until further Court order. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/11/2017. (LMF)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order 57 ORDER denying 39 Defendant, Avon Products, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/20/2016. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen Systems Group, Inc. v. Avon Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Systems Group, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Friedland
Represented By: Shannon M. Jost
Represented By: Jaime Rich Vining
Represented By: Theresa Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products, Inc.
Represented By: Evan R. Chesler
Represented By: Benjamin Gruenstein
Represented By: Aaron Andrew Haak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?