Real v. The City of Fort Myers et al

Plaintiff: Mamberto Real
Defendant: The City of Fort Myers, Derrick Diggs and Michel Perry
Case Number: 2:2017cv00117
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2018 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 Amended Complaint filed by Mamberto Real. The Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/7/2018. (LMF)
May 3, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant City of Fort Myers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 5/3/2018. (DRS)
April 30, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 4/30/2018. (DRS)
April 13, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Plaintiff's Letter Motion to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 4/13/2018. (HJ)
April 11, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 25 Defendant Michael Perry's Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 26 Defendant City of Fort Myers' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaints. Defendants must respond to the Second Amended Complaint on or before April 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/11/2018. (LMF)
April 6, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 30 Defendants' Motion to Quash; granting 32 Defendants' Joint Amended Motion to Quash. Plaintiff's Subpoenas (Docs. 31-1, 31-2, 31-3) are QUASHED. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for April 18, 2018 is CANCELLED. A Notice rescheduling a Preliminary Pretrial Conference will be issued separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 4/6/2018. (HJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Real v. The City of Fort Myers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamberto Real
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Fort Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Diggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?