Prunty et al v. Desoto County School Board and District et al
Plaintiff: Robert R. Prunty and India L. Prunty
Defendant: Desoto County School Board and District, Karyn E. Gary, Angela Staley, Agency for Healthcare Administration, Shevaun Harris, Elizabeth Dudek, Damon Rich and The Jack Nicklaus Miami Children's Hospital
Case Number: 2:2017cv00291
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION AND ORDER granting 27 motion to dismiss; granting 28 motion to dismiss; granting 39 motion to dismiss and the 25 First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions (terminating 64 Motion) and deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/22/2017. (RKR)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION AND ORDER striking 35 Motion to Certify Class and the motion is deemed stricken; granting 45 Motion to Strike Own Previously Filed Motion; denying 48 motion for recusal or disqualification; denying 50 Motion to Certify Class; denying 52 Motion to Vacate; denying 59 Motion for reconsideration; denying 38 Motion seeking Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/31/2017. (RKR)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 26 Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay Requirement to Conduct a Case Management Conference and File a Case Management Report. The parties shall conduct a case management conference and file a case management report within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of judicial resolution of the pending motions to dismiss (Docs. 27, 28, 39). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 7/18/2017. (HJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prunty et al v. Desoto County School Board and District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Prunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: India L. Prunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desoto County School Board and District
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Jensen
Represented By: Thomas Robert Unice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyn E. Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agency for Healthcare Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shevaun Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Dudek
Represented By: Anne F. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jack Nicklaus Miami Children's Hospital
Represented By: Glenn P. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?