Pedro-Mejia et al v. Franco Plastering Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Basilio Pedro-Mejia and Antonio Pedro-Mejia
Defendant: Franco Plastering Inc. and Martin Franco
Case Number: 2:2017cv00452
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Collier
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Referring Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint; granting 43 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Mandatory Contact Information Required in Rule 26 Initial Di sclosures. Defendants shall have up to and including March 9, 2018 to amend the first and third affirmative defenses in compliance with this Order and to provide the last known addresses of the individuals identified in their Rule 26 initial disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 2/23/2018. (HJ)
October 31, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement. Defendants shall file an Answer on or before November 10, 2017. Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses 16 is STRICKEN. The Clerk of Court is directed to make a notation on the docket that the filing is stricken. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/31/2017. (LMF)
October 11, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Clerk's Default; granting 20 Unopposed Motion of Defendants Franco Plastering, Inc. and Martin Franco for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants Franco Plastering, Inc. and Martin Franco shall have up to and including Friday, October 13, 2017 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 10/11/2017. (KBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedro-Mejia et al v. Franco Plastering Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basilio Pedro-Mejia
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Pedro-Mejia
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franco Plastering Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?