Shabazz v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Abdul Hakeen Jahmal Naseer Shabazz
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Corrections, J. Sanchez, L. Norwood, Patrick Murphy and W. Millette
Case Number: 2:2017cv00648
Filed: September 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 OPINION AND ORDER denying 164 Motion for Permissive Joinder; denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/1/2021. (RKR)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting 141 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The requirement for a bond is waived. See separate preliminary injunction for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/24/2020. (RKR)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting 140 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as set forth in the Order. The TRO remains in place for a period of 14 days from the date of this Order, and the requirement for a bond is waived. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/10/2020. (RKR)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER granting 88 motion to dismiss and the Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to defendant Morales; granting in part and denying in part 96 motion to dismiss as to defendant Stewart. Plaintiff's Fourteenth A mendment Equal Protection claim is dismissed with prejudice and and the First Amendment retaliation claim against Stewart is dismissed without prejudice due to lack of exhaustion. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendant Morales and prov ide plaintiff with a blank civil rights complaint form with this Opinion and Order. Within 20 days, Stewart shall file an answer to the First Amendment Free Exercise claim contained in the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/27/2019. (RKR)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying as moot 32 Motion for Modification or Clarification of Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order; denying 56 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction. Plaintiff shall file a notice within 14 days and clarify whether he seeks to enjoin defendants from enforcing the half-inch grooming policy. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/12/2018. (RKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shabazz v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Hakeen Jahmal Naseer Shabazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Represented By: Shelley B. Cridlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Sanchez
Represented By: Shelley B. Cridlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Norwood
Represented By: Shelley B. Cridlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Murphy
Represented By: Shelley B. Cridlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Millette
Represented By: Shelley B. Cridlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?