Mela Properties v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Plaintiff: Mela Properties, LLC
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Case Number: 2:2018cv00404
Filed: June 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Certain Allegations within the Defendant's Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 2/4/2019. (DRS)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 7 Amended Complaint filed by Mela Properties, LLC. Plaintiff Mela Properties, LLC's Amended Complaint (Doc. 7 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint on or before August 29, 2018. Failure to do so will result in the Court closing this case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/22/2018. (LMF)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing case.Plaintiff Mela Properties, LLC's Complaint (Doc. 1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Mela may file an amended complaint consistent with this Order on or before June 19, 2018. Failure to do so will result in the Court closing this case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/12/2018. (LMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mela Properties v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mela Properties, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Boyle, Sr.
Represented By: Gregory Len Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?