Paradise Enterprises, Inc.

Petitioner: Paradise Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00527
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Collier
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 13 PROOF of publication filed by Paradise Enterprises, Inc.. Newspaper: News-Press Date(s) of publication 8/17/18; 8/24/18; 8/31/18; 9/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of publication)(Davant, Charles)
August 21, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Paradise Enterprises, Inc.. (Davant, Charles)
August 21, 2018 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Paradise Enterprises, Inc.. Related case(s): NO (Davant, Charles)
August 7, 2018 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/21/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/7/2018. (jmc)
August 7, 2018 9 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/21/2018. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/7/2018. (jmc)
August 7, 2018 8 NOTICE OF PETITION for exoneration from or limitation of liability by Paradise Enterprises, Inc. re #7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (MLS)
August 6, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Entry of Order Approving Petitioner's Ad Interim Stipulation and Directing Issuance of Monition and Injunction. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue the Notice of Petition for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/6/2018. (brh)
August 1, 2018 6 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Order Approving Petitioner's Ad Interim Stipulation and Directing Issuance of Monition and Injunction by Paradise Enterprises, Inc.. (Davant, Charles)
August 1, 2018 5 NOTICE by Paradise Enterprises, Inc. re #1 Complaint Notice of filing Notice of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability)(Davant, Charles)
August 1, 2018 4 NOTICE by Paradise Enterprises, Inc. re #3 Stipulation for costs Notice of filing Proposed Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Directing Issuance of Monition and Injunction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Monition and Injunction)(Davant, Charles)
August 1, 2018 3 STIPULATION for value and stipulation of costs by Paradise Enterprises, Inc. (Davant, Charles) Modified on 8/1/2018 as to text(MLS).
July 31, 2018 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/31/2018. (MLS)
July 31, 2018 1 PETITION for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $400 receipt number FtM012775) filed by Paradise Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paradise Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paradise Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?