Gavin et al v. Teraphysics Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Linda V. Gavin and Paul E. Gavin
Defendant: Thomas Honeywill, Jerry Cuomo, James Dayton, Gerald Mearini, Teraphysics Corporation, Louis Fisi and Gerald W. Cowden
Case Number: 2:2018cv00532
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2018 44 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Duke, Jarred) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit docket text (drn).
September 17, 2018 43 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/17/2018. (ATC)
September 17, 2018 42 MOTION for leave to to conduct Case Management Conference telephonically by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin. (Mancini, C.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 9/18/2018 to edit docket text (drn).
September 10, 2018 41 WAIVER of service returned executed on September 6, 2018 by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin as to Louis Fisi. (Mancini, C.)
September 10, 2018 40 WAIVER of service returned executed on September 6, 2018 by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin as to Jerry Cuomo. (Mancini, C.)
September 10, 2018 39 WAIVER of service returned executed on September 5, 2018 by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin as to Gerald W. Cowden. (Mancini, C.)
September 10, 2018 38 WAIVER of service returned executed on September 7, 2018 by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin as to Gerald Mearini. (Mancini, C.)
September 10, 2018 37 WAIVER of service returned executed on September 6, 2018 by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin as to Teraphysics Corporation. (Mancini, C.)
August 28, 2018 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Jerry Cuomo. (Gegan, Edmund)
August 28, 2018 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Jerry Cuomo (Gegan, Edmund)
August 28, 2018 34 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jerry Cuomo. Related case(s): NO (Gegan, Edmund)
August 28, 2018 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Gerald W. Cowden. (Gegan, Edmund)
August 28, 2018 32 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gerald W. Cowden. Related case(s): NO (Gegan, Edmund)
August 28, 2018 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Gerald W. Cowden (Gegan, Edmund)
August 28, 2018 30 WAIVER of service returned executed on August 15, 2018 by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin as to James Dayton. (Mancini, C.)
August 28, 2018 29 WAIVER of service returned executed on August 15, 2018 by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin as to Thomas Honeywill. (Mancini, C.)
August 27, 2018 28 AMENDED NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Thomas Honeywill. Related case(s): NO (Gegan, Edmund) Modified on 8/28/2018 to edit docket text (drn)
August 27, 2018 27 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #17 Interested persons order, #15 Interested persons order by James Dayton, Louis Fisi, Thomas Honeywill, Gerald Mearini, Teraphysics Corporation identifying Other Affiliate mmLink, Inc. for Teraphysics Corporation.. (Gegan, Edmund) Modified on 8/28/2018 to edit docket text (drn).
August 27, 2018 26 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Thomas Honeywill. Related case(s): Yes (Gegan, Edmund)
August 27, 2018 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Thomas Honeywill (Gegan, Edmund)
August 27, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER treating #23 Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Record to an Attorney Within the Same Firm as a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and granting the Motion. Attorney Alexander Howell shall have no further responsibility in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/27/2018. (ATC)
August 24, 2018 23 NOTICE by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin of Substitution of Counsel of Attorney within the same firm (Mancini, C.) Modified on 8/27/2018 to edit filing event (drn).
August 21, 2018 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Interested persons order by Louis Fisi, Gerald Mearini, Teraphysics Corporation. (Gegan, Edmund)
August 21, 2018 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #17 Interested persons order by James Dayton. (Gegan, Edmund)
August 21, 2018 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by James Dayton, Louis Fisi, Gerald Mearini, Teraphysics Corporation. Related case(s): NO (Gegan, Edmund)
August 21, 2018 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related Case Order and Track 2 Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Paul E. Gavin. Related case(s): No (Mancini, C.) Modified on 8/21/2018 as to text(MLS).
August 21, 2018 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Paul E. Gavin. (Mancini, C.)
August 20, 2018 17 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to James Dayton. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/4/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/20/2018. (drn)
August 17, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of James Dayton (Gegan, Edmund)
August 16, 2018 15 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Louis Fisi, Teraphysics Corporation and Gerald Mearini. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/30/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/16/2018. (drn)
August 16, 2018 14 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 10/1/2018. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
August 15, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Gerald Mearini (Gegan, Edmund)
August 15, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Louis Fisi, Teraphysics Corporation (Gegan, Edmund)
August 6, 2018 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/20/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/6/2018. (jmc)
August 6, 2018 10 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/20/2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/6/2018. (jmc)
August 3, 2018 9 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/3/2018. (drn)
August 1, 2018 8 SUMMONS issued as to Gerald W. Cowden. (RMT)
August 1, 2018 7 SUMMONS issued as to Jerry Cuomo. (RMT)
August 1, 2018 6 SUMMONS issued as to Thomas Honeywill. (RMT)
August 1, 2018 5 SUMMONS issued as to James Dayton. (RMT)
August 1, 2018 4 SUMMONS issued as to Louis Fisi. (RMT)
August 1, 2018 3 SUMMONS issued as to Gerald Mearini. (RMT)
August 1, 2018 2 SUMMONS issued as to Teraphysics Corporation. (RMT)
August 1, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Gerald W. Cowden, Jerry Cuomo, James Dayton, Louis Fisi, Thomas Honeywill, Gerald Mearini with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number FtM012779) filed by Linda V. Gavin, Paul E. Gavin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gavin et al v. Teraphysics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Honeywill
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Cuomo
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dayton
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Mearini
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teraphysics Corporation
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Fisi
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald W. Cowden
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda V. Gavin
Represented By: Alexander Howell
Represented By: C. Richard Mancini
Represented By: Jarred D. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul E. Gavin
Represented By: Alexander Howell
Represented By: C. Richard Mancini
Represented By: Jarred D. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?