Bucci v. R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Bucci
Defendant: R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00762
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
1 Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Lee County, Florida. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate pending motions and deadlines and close the case.Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/7/2019. (LMF)
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 1/28/2019. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fuhrman, Troy)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion to Conduct Meeting of Parties Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/30/2018. (ATC)
November 29, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. Related case(s): no (Fuhrman, Troy)
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company identifying Corporate Parent Reynolds American, Inc., Corporate Parent RAI Innovations Company for R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company.. (Fuhrman, Troy)
November 29, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Fuhrman, Troy)
November 29, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Murphy Oil USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Murphy USA, Inc. for Murphy Oil USA, Inc... (Fuhrman, Troy)
November 29, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to conduct Meeting of Parties Telephonically by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Fuhrman, Troy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to remand to State Court by Joseph Bucci. (Gillen, Patrick)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joseph Bucci. Related case(s): NO (Gillen, Patrick)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Joseph Bucci. (Gillen, Patrick)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 11/16/18, including cover letter, copy of complaint, notice of removal and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Complaint) (drn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Murphy Oil USA, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/30/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/16/2018. (drn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/16/2018. (drn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Murphy Oil USA, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company with Jury Demand filed by Joseph Bucci in State Court on 9/19/18.(drn)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/29/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/15/2018. (WRW)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/29/2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/15/2018. (WRW)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Fuhrman, Troy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:18-cv-762-FtM-38MRM. (NAS)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Murphy Oil USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Murphy USA Inc. for Murphy Oil USA, Inc... (Fuhrman, Troy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company identifying Corporate Parent Reynolds American Inc., Corporate Parent RAI Innovations Company for R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company.. (Fuhrman, Troy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Murphy Oil USA, Inc..(Fuhrman, Troy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company.(Fuhrman, Troy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial Circuit Court of Florida, case number 2018-CA-004547 filed in State Court on 09/19/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14821645 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint with service documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - All remaining state court documents, #4 Exhibit 4 - JS-44)(Fuhrman, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bucci v. R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bucci
Represented By: Patrick Alexander Gillen
Represented By: Robert Frank Melton, II
Represented By: C. Richard Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company
Represented By: Troy A. Fuhrman
Represented By: David M. Monde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Represented By: Troy A. Fuhrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?