Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC v. Oakes Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC
Defendant: Oakes Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00074
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Telephonically to Conduct Case Management Meeting by Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC. (Dooley, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Oakes Farms, Inc.. (Bracci, Steven)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oakes Farms, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Invoices Part 2, #3 Exhibit B - exemplar USDA Market Reports, #4 Exhibit C - Market Summary Report)(Dooley, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Oakes Farms, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Bracci, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Oakes Farms, Inc.. (Bracci, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Oakes Farms, Inc.. (Bracci, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. The response shall be filed no later than March 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/7/2019. (ATC)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Oakes Farms, Inc.. (Bracci, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC. Related case(s): no (Dooley, Matthew)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 02/14/2019 by Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC as to Oakes Farms, Inc.. (Dooley, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Oakes Farms, Inc. (drn)
February 12, 2019 FEES paid by Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number FtM013446) re #1 (drn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/25/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/11/2019. (WRW)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/11/2019. (WRW)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC. (Dooley, Matthew)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/7/2019. (drn)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-74-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oakes Farms, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Invoices (Part 1), #3 Exhibit A - Invoices (Part 2), #4 Exhibit B - Exemplar USDA Market Reports, #5 Exhibit C - Statement of Account (Spring 2018), #6 Exhibit D - Statement of Account (Fall 2018), #7 Proposed Summons)(Dooley, Matthew) Modified on 2/6/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC v. Oakes Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Wilder Investments, LLC
Represented By: Matthew A. Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakes Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Bracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?