New Pink Shell, LLC v. CMME Properties, LLC et al

Plaintiff: New Pink Shell, LLC
Defendant: CMME Properties, LLC, Linda M Shenko, Ryreal Florida LLC, Diane Crawford, Judith E Clifford, EReal Estate Holdings, LLC, Carrie Lucas, William E Shenko, Homeaway.com, Inc., Charles Lucas, Merv Larson Holdings, LLC and Robert Burns
Case Number: 2:2019cv00196
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:0044
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 Defendant Homeaway.com, Inc.'s Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown and because the motion is unopposed, Defendant shall have up to and including August 1, 2019 to respond to #1 the Complaint for Trademark Infringement, Dilution, Unfair Competition, False Advertising, Deceptive and Unfair Trade Practices, Facilitating Trademark Infringement, and Unjust Enrichment. In addition, the parties shall meet, prepare, and file the Case Management Report in conformity with the #6 Track Two Notice by August 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/12/2019. (HAP)
July 11, 2019 Filing 40 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by Homeaway.com, Inc.. (Marston, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
July 9, 2019 Filing 39 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-196-FtM-29NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (RMT)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER dismissing Ryreal Florida LLC without prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate this defendant on the docket. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/18/2019. (RKR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by New Pink Shell, LLC (Giordano, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER deeming defendant Robert Burns dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate defendant on the docket. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/14/2019. (RKR)
June 13, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by New Pink Shell, LLC (Giordano, Paul)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Defendant Homeaway.com, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown and because the motion is unopposed, Defendant shall have up to and including July 11, 2019 to file its Corporate Disclosure Statement and respond to #1 the Complaint for Trademark Infringement, Dilution, Unfair Competition, False Advertising, Deceptive and Unfair Trade Practices, Facilitating Trademark Infringement and Unjust Enrichment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/10/2019. (HAP)
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homeaway.com, Inc.. (Marston, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
May 23, 2019 Filing 32 RETURN of service executed on 5/7/19 by New Pink Shell, LLC as to CMME Properties, LLC. (Giordano, Paul)
May 23, 2019 Filing 31 RETURN of service executed on 5/8/19 by New Pink Shell, LLC as to Ryreal Florida LLC. (Giordano, Paul)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Merv Larson Holdings, LLC only with each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk shall terminate this defendant on the docket. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/22/2019. (RKR)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by New Pink Shell, LLC (Giordano, Paul)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER dismissing without prejudice CMME Properties, LLC and EReal Estate Holdings, LLC. The Clerk shall terminate these defendants on the docket. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/20/2019. (RKR)
May 15, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by New Pink Shell, LLC (Giordano, Paul)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER dismissing defendants Charles Lucas, Carrie Lucas, and Diane Crawford without prejudice with each party to bear their own costs and attorney fees. The Clerk shall terminate theses defendants on the docket. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/13/2019. (RKR)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying without prejudice #22 Plaintiff's Second Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David V. Radack Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing; and granting #23 Plaintiff's Second Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sandy B. Garfinkel Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/3/2019. (CAS)
May 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by New Pink Shell, LLC (Giordano, Paul)
May 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Sandy B. Garfinkel to appear pro hac vice by New Pink Shell, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giordano, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
May 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for David V. Radack to appear pro hac vice by New Pink Shell, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giordano, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
April 30, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF of service by New Pink Shell, LLC as to Judith Clifford(Giordano, Paul)
April 26, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF of service by New Pink Shell, LLC as to ERealEstate Holdings, LLC on 4/11/19 (Giordano, Paul) Modified on 4/26/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF of service by New Pink Shell, LLC as to Charles Lucas on 4/16/19(Giordano, Paul) Modified on 4/26/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF of service by New Pink Shell, LLC as to Carrie Lucas on 4/16/19(Giordano, Paul) Modified on 4/26/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF of service by New Pink Shell, LLC as to Robert Burns on 4/17/19(Giordano, Paul) Modified on 4/26/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #14 the Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David V. Radack, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing; denying without prejudice #15 the Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sandy B. Garfinkel, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 4/25/2019. (APH)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Sandy B. Garfinkel to appear pro hac vice by New Pink Shell, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giordano, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for David V. Radack to appear pro hac vice by New Pink Shell, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giordano, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
April 22, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Sandy B. Garfinkel, appearing on behalf of New Pink Shell, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013655.). (MLS)
April 22, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney David V Radack, appearing on behalf of New Pink Shell, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013654.). (MLS)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sandy B. Garfinkel; denying without prejudice #12 the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David V. Radack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 4/19/2019. (APH)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for David V. Radack to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giordano, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. Modified on 4/19/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Sandy B. Garfinkel to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giordano, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by New Pink Shell, LLC of Voluntary Dismiss of Certain Defendants (Giordano, Paul)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by New Pink Shell, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Boykin Management Company, LLC, Corporate Parent New Pink Shell, LLC, Corporate Parent Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC, Corporate Parent CMME Properties, LLC, Corporate Parent Merv Larson Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Homeaway.com, Inc., Corporate Parent Erealestate Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Robert Burns, Other Affiliate Diane Crawford, Other Affiliate Charles Lucas, Other Affiliate Carrie Lucas, Other Affiliate Judith E Clifford for New Pink Shell, LLC.. (Giordano, Paul)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by New Pink Shell, LLC. Related case(s): no (Giordano, Paul)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/16/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/2/2019. (WRW)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/16/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/2/2019. (WRW)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (MLS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/29/2019. (MLS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-196-FtM-29UAM. (NAS)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15293858) filed by New Pink Shell, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Giordano, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Pink Shell, LLC v. CMME Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Pink Shell, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Giordano
Represented By: Sandy B. Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMME Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda M Shenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryreal Florida LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith E Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EReal Estate Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E Shenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeaway.com, Inc.
Represented By: David Weese Marston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merv Larson Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?