Roor International BV et al v. Mellowmood Tobaco Shop et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Mellowmood Tobaco Shop and Huan T Huynh
Case Number: 2:2019cv00221
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for default judgment against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Affidavit as to Damages, #3 Affidavit as to Value of Damages, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sasson, Jamie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Huan T Huynh, Mellowmood Tobaco Shop by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 4/15/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Mellowmood Tobaco Shop. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 4/15/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Huan T Huynh. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (drn)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/25/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/11/2019. (WRW)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/11/2019. (WRW)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/10/2019. (drn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Mellowmood Tobaco Shop. (drn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Huan T Huynh. (drn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-221-FtM-99MRM. (SJB)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15334031) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Mellowmood Tobaco Shop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellowmood Tobaco Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huan T Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?