Hernandez-Castillo v. Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Gregorio Hernandez-Castillo
Respondent: Attorney General of the United States, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Ronald D. Vitiello, Marc J. Moore, Kevin K. McAleenan and William P. Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00225
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER if Petitioner wishes to file a reply, however, Petitioner must do so within thirty (30) days from the date on this Order re #7 Response to habeas petition filed by Ronald D. Vitiello, Marc J. Moore, Kevin K. McAleenan, William P. Barr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/5/2019. (SLU)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus by William P. Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Marc J. Moore, Ronald D. Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Sullivan, David)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Response to petition due within forty-five (45) days from the date on this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 VERIFIED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 - Federal (Doc. #1))(SLU)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gregorio Hernandez-Castillo. Related case(s): yes (Benincasa, Vincent)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/25/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/11/2019. (SLU)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/11/2019. (SLU)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-225-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED PETITION for Writ of Habeas CorpusPursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 - Federal (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 113A-15337286) filed by Gregorio Hernandez-Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Proposed Summons Kevin K. McAleenan, #4 Proposed Summons William P. Barr, #5 Proposed Summons Marc J. Moore, #6 Proposed Summons Ronald D. Vitiello)(Benincasa, Vincent) Modified on 4/11/2019 to edit docket text (SLU). Modified on 6/25/2019 (SLU). Courtesy copy provided.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez-Castillo v. Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregorio Hernandez-Castillo
Represented By: Vincent James Benincasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: David P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marc J. Moore
Represented By: David P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: David P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: David P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?