Barker v. FEDEX, Inc
Plaintiff: Steve Barker
Defendant: FEDEX, Inc and Fedex
Case Number: 2:2019cv00280
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. (MLJ)
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing scheduled for 8/7/2019 at 10:30 a.m. To be rescheduled by separate notice. (MLJ)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Rescheduling the Pretrial Conference for August 2019 Other Than August 2 and 7, 2019. The preliminary pretrial conference set for August 7, 2019, is hereby cancelled. The preliminary pretrial conference will be reset by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/26/2019. (CAS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Continue pretrial from August 7 to another date other than August 7 or August 2 2019 by Steve Barker. (Romano, Jay)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. Any motion or other filing pertaining to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference must be filed three (3) business days in advance of the hearing to ensure consideration. ALL parties must appear telephonically. The toll free teleconference number is 1-888-684-8852. The access code is 1982804. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 19280. ALL parties are to appear by landline and not a cellular phone. (MLJ)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing scheduled for 7/24/2019 at 11:00 a.m. To be rescheduled by separate notice. (MLJ)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Counsel to Appear by Telephone for Pretrial Conference and for Rescheduling the Pretrial Conference for August 2019 Due to Both Counsel Unavailability. The preliminary pretrial conference currently set for July 24, 2019, is cancelled. The preliminary pretrial conference will be reset by separate notice. The parties shall appear telephonically at the reset preliminary pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/24/2019. (CAS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically for pretrial conference, Unopposed MOTION to Continue pretrial conference until August by Steve Barker. (Romano, Jay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. (MLJ)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have until July 8, 2019, in which to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/19/2019. (CAS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Plaintiff's complaint by Fedex. (Wiggins, Allison)
May 13, 2019 FILING FEES paid by Steve Barker (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number FtM013721) per 11 Order (MLS)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued as to Fedex. (MLS)
May 11, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Steve Barker. (Romano, Jay)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER. The matter comes before the Court on review of the file. Plaintiff has been denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis; therefore, Plaintiff is directed to pay the filing fee by May 24, 2019. Failure to do so will result in this case being closed for failure to prosecute without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/10/2019. (BLW)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/3/2019. (CAS)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steve Barker. (Romano, Jay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/15/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/1/2019. (MLJ)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/15/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/1/2019. (MLJ)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 4/30/2019. (CAS)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/30/2019. (RMT)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-280-FtM-99UAM. (SJB)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Steve Barker. (Romano, Jay)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steve Barker. (Romano, Jay)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDEX, Inc with Jury Demand filed by Steve Barker. (Attachments: #1 waiver, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Romano, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. FEDEX, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex
Represented By: Allison Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Barker
Represented By: Jay F. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?