McCord v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LEON MCCORD
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00318
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-318-FtM-99NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (MLS)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MLS)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Leon McCord. Related case(s): no (Avard, Carol)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/31/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/17/2019. (MLJ)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk is directed to file all pleadings in this cause without prepayment of costs, and the United States Marshal, upon receipt of appropriate instructions in proper form from the Plaintiff, is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of costs or fees. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to prepare and forward the completed service forms to the Clerk for service by the United States Marshal. Failure to provide these documents within this time period will cause the Court to recommend that this action be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/16/2019. (CAS)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/16/2019. (MLS)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (MLS)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-318-FtM-99UAM. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. (SJB)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL LEON MCCORD. (Avard, Carol)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by MICHAEL LEON MCCORD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCord v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LEON MCCORD
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?