Huyler v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Carla Huyler
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00330
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to extend time to 08/02/2019 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Drummond, Alexandre) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
July 18, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Drummond, Alexandre) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
July 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 7/24/2019 at 11:15 AM is rescheduled. New hearing time: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 02:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW)
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 7/24/2019 at 11:30 AM is rescheduled. New hearing time: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 11:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 Case Reassigned to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. New case number: 2:19-cv-330-FtM-38NPM. Judge Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER. The parties are DIRECTED to file the Case Management Report no later than 5:00 P.M. on July 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/12/2019. (HAP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-330-FtM-99NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (MLS)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Within 7 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 7/3/2019. (CAS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement and Release of Claims)(Drummond, Alexandre)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 11:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. (MLJ)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Defendant shall have until June 28, 2019, in which to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/18/2019. (CAS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummond, Alexandre)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Drummond, Alexandre)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): Yes (Drummond, Alexandre)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Carla Huyler. (Webb, Dennis)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Carla Huyler. Related case(s): Yes (Webb, Dennis)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Carla Huyler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1")(Webb, Dennis)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall have until June 28, 2019, in which to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/29/2019. (CAS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummond, Alexandre) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Notice of voluntary dismissal filed by Carla Huyler. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of All Claims Under 42 U.S.C. 1981 and Title VII (Doc. #5) is DENIED without prejudice to filing a motion for leave to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/28/2019. (LMF)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/11/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/28/2019. (MLJ)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/28/2019. (MLJ)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Carla Huyler (Webb, Dennis)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/23/2019. (RMT)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand filed by Carla Huyler.(RMT)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-330-FtM-99UAM. (SJB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentienth Judicial Circuit, case number 19-CA-2496 filed in State Court on April 30, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15491665 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Drummond, Alexandre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huyler v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alexandre S. Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Huyler
Represented By: Dennis Louis Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?