Butler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Larry J. Butler
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00331
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice, #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Commissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): yes (Rudy, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Larry J. Butler. Related case(s): y (RMT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Larry J. Butler. (RMT)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/12/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/29/2019. (jmc)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/11/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/28/2019. (MLJ)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/28/2019. (MLJ)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/23/2019. (drn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (RMT)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Filing fee $400, receipt number FtM013740 filed by Larry J. Butler. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 Appendix 3, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?