Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of American LLC v. ASI Assurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of American LLC A/A/O Theodore Smith and Cathy Smith and Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of America, LLC
Defendant: ASI Assurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00333
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing defendant to supplement re #1 Notice of Removal filed by ASI Assurance Corporation within 7 days indicating why the case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/19/2019. (RKR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Jurgus, Tracy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ASI Assurance Corporation, Corporate Parent Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of America, LLC, Other Affiliate Harold Levy, Other Affiliate Cathy Smith, Other Affiliate Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP, Other Affiliate DDA CLAIMS MANAGEMENT, Other Affiliate HL Law Group, P.A., Other Affiliate Aileen Falcon, Other Affiliate Theodore Smith, Other Affiliate JS Held, Other Affiliate Michael J Lewis, Other Affiliate Tracy A. Jurgus for Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of America, LLC.. (Falcon, Aileen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related cases order and Track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of America, LLC. Related case(s): YES (Falcon, Aileen) Modified on 6/12/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aileen N. Falcon on behalf of Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of America, LLC (Falcon, Aileen)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by ASI Assurance Corporation. (Jurgus, Tracy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by ASI Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jurgus, Tracy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/11/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/28/2019. (MLJ)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/28/2019. (MLJ)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/24/2019. (drn)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-333-FtM-99MRM. (SJB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against ASI Assurance Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of America, LLC. in State Court on 3/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(drn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial Circuit, Collier County, case number 11-2019-CA-001269-0001-XX filed in State Court on 03/28/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15495510 filed by ASI Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jurgus, Tracy) Modified on 5/23/2019 to edit docket text (drn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of American LLC v. ASI Assurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASI Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Ann Jurgus
Represented By: Samera Beshir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of American LLC A/A/O Theodore Smith and Cathy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roofing & Reconstruction Contractors of America, LLC
Represented By: Aileen N. Falcon
Represented By: Elizabeth Mitchell
Represented By: Harold Y. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?