Aero-Docks, LLC v. ASAR, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Aero-Docks, LLC
Defendant: GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc. and ASAR, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00348
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 25 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/8/2019 as to defendant(s) ASAR, Inc. and GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc.. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/25/2019. (MLS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc..(Daker, Angela)
July 22, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ASAR, Inc..(Daker, Angela)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by ASAR, Inc., GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc.. (Daker, Angela)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #19 the Special Admission Attorney Certification, which was erroneously docketed as a Motion for Nathan B. Webb to appear pro hac vice. Counsel may file an appropriate motion seeking leave to appear pro hac vice in this matter and, in doing so, must comply with M.D. Fla. R. 2.02. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/2/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #18 the Special Admission Attorney Certification, which was erroneously docketed as a Motion for Walter J. Kawula, Jr. to appear pro hac vice. Counsel may file an appropriate motion seeking leave to appear pro hac vice in this matter and, in doing so, must comply with M.D. Fla. R. 2.02. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/2/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Nathan B. Webb to appear pro hac vice by Aero-Docks, LLC. (Tripp, Theodore) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Walter J. Kawula, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by Aero-Docks, LLC. (Tripp, Theodore) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants must file a response to the Complaint no later than 7/22/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/19/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by ASAR, Inc., GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc.. (Daker, Angela) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Angela D. Daker on behalf of ASAR, Inc., GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc. (Daker, Angela)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Aero-Docks, LLC. (Tripp, Theodore)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Return of Service as to GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc. by Aero-Docks,(Tripp, Theodore)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Aero-Docks, LLC of Filing Return of Service as to ASAR, Inc. (Tripp, Theodore)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/14/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/31/2019. (jmc)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/31/2019. (jmc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of compliance with Standing Order by Aero-Docks, LLC (Tripp, Theodore)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. via US Mail (MLS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/29/2019. (MLS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc.. (MLS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to ASAR, Inc.. (MLS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Aero-Docks, LLC. (Tripp, Theodore)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Aero-Docks, LLC. (Tripp, Theodore)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-348-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASAR, Inc., GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15512090) filed by Aero-Docks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tripp, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aero-Docks, LLC v. ASAR, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCM Contracting Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Angela D. Daker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASAR, Inc.
Represented By: Angela D. Daker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aero-Docks, LLC
Represented By: Theodore Lawton Tripp, Jr.
Represented By: Walter J. Kawula
Represented By: Nathan B. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?