Melton v. Public Works of Charlotte County, FL
Plaintiff: Myriah Melton
Defendant: Public Works of Charlotte County, FL
Case Number: 2:2019cv00357
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (MLJ)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED: The Complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate any pending deadlines, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/16/2019. (SMG)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-357-38NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (MLS)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to show cause as to Myriah Melton. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE or otherwise supplement the Complaint on or before July 10, 2019, as why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Failure to do so will result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/26/2019. (AEH)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to show cause as to Myriah Melton. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE or otherwise supplement the Complaint on or before June 21, 2019, as why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/7/2019. (LMF)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/20/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/6/2019. (MLJ)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/6/2019. (MLJ)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/5/2019. (MLS)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Public Works of Charlotte County, FL; no fee/ifp filed by Myriah Melton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melton v. Public Works of Charlotte County, FL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriah Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Works of Charlotte County, FL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?