Cruz Rangel v. Harplyn, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jose Cruz Rangel
Defendant: Harplyn, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00388
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Farrelly, Jessica)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/9/2019. (jmc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 8/19/2019. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement re #9 Interested Persons Order by Harplyn, Inc.. (Farrelly, Jessica) Modified on 7/3/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to re #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Harplyn, Inc..(Farrelly, Jessica) Modified on 7/3/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/28/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/14/2019. (jmc)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/14/2019. (jmc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jose Cruz Rangel. (Malatesta, Frank) Modified on 6/12/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jose Cruz Rangel. Related case(s): No (Malatesta, Frank)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/11/2019. (MLS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Harplyn, Inc.. (MLS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-388-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jose Cruz Rangel. (Malatesta, Frank)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harplyn, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15561625) filed by Jose Cruz Rangel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Right To Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malatesta, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz Rangel v. Harplyn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harplyn, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica M. Farrelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cruz Rangel
Represented By: Frank Michael Malatesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?