Jasper Contractors Inc. et al v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Charles Friedlander and Jasper Contractors Inc.
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00399
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dornstein, Scott)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER requiring the parties to file their Case Management Report on or before 5:00 p.m. on Friday, August 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 8/7/2019. (brh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 8/7/2019 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER. The Court will take no further action on its Order (Doc. 15) after Defendant Lexington Insurance Company's Response to Endorsed Order to Show Cause (Doc. #16). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/16/2019. (CMC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company re 14 Order no pdf (Dornstein, Scott)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lexington Insurance Company.(Dornstein, Scott)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the file. Defendant Lexington Insurance Company was served with the Complaint on May 16, 2019, and then removed the case to this Court on June 14, 2019. (Doc. #1). But it has not answered or otherwise responded to the Complaint, and the time to do so has expired. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(b). Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS Lexington to show cause why it has not responded to the Complaint on or before July 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/15/2019. (CMC)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-399-FtM-38NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (MLS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jasper Contractors Inc.. (Rechtin, Thomas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Jasper Contractors Inc.. (Rechtin, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group Inc, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US Inc, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc for Lexington Insurance Company.. (Dornstein, Scott)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lexington Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Dornstein, Scott)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. Any motion or other filing pertaining to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference must be filed three (3) business days in advance of the hearing to ensure consideration.(MLJ)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/1/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/17/2019. (jmc)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/17/2019. (jmc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/17/2019. (RMT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Lexington Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Jasper Contractors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RMT)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Rule 7.1 Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group Inc, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US Inc, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc for Lexington Insurance Company.. (Dornstein, Scott)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-399-FtM-38UAM. (SJB)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit, case number 19-CA-002635 filed in State Court on 05-03-2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15579771 filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dornstein, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jasper Contractors Inc. et al v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Dornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Friedlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper Contractors Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Rechtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?