CMR Construction and Roofing, LLC a/a/o Carminda Barbosa v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: CMR Construction and Roofing, LLC a/a/o Carminda Barbosa
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00405
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Connolly, Hugh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE to counsel Anaili Triana of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel Anaili Triana of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel Caroline Portuondo of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel Caroline Portuondo of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Property Insurance Company f/k/a ARK Royal Insurance for American Strategic Insurance Corp... (Connolly, Hugh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related cases order and Track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Related case(s): No (Connolly, Hugh) Modified on 7/2/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/2/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/18/2019. (jmc)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/2/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/18/2019. (jmc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/17/2019. (MLS)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp. with Jury Demand filed by CMR Construction and Roofing, LLC a/a/o Carminda Barbosa (filed in STATE Court on 3/27/19). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MLS)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Strategic Insurance Corp..(Connolly, Hugh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-405-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant's from Collier Circuit Court, case number 11-2019-CA-001245-0001-XX filed in State Court on 3/27/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15581994 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents All state court filings, #3 State Court Other Documents Correspondence, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connolly, Hugh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMR Construction and Roofing, LLC a/a/o Carminda Barbosa v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Hugh Joseph Connolly, IV
Represented By: Caroline Portuondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMR Construction and Roofing, LLC a/a/o Carminda Barbosa
Represented By: Anthony J. Tinelli
Represented By: Anaili Triana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?