Tumlin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sandra Gayle Tumlin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00457
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 US Marshal 285 form for service via U.S. certified mail as to the U.S. Attorney. (MLJ)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 US Marshal 285 form for service via U.S. certified mail as to the Social Security Commissioner. (MLJ)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 US Marshal 285 form for service via U.S. certified mail as to the U.S. Attorney General. (MLJ)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MLJ)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sandra Gayle Tumlin. Related case(s): no (Avard, Carol)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit of Indigency construed as a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 7/9/2019. (brh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-457-FtM-38NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (MLS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/23/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/9/2019. (WRW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/3/2019. (MLS)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/3/2019. (MLS)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (MLS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-457-FtM-38UAM. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. (SJB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sandra Gayle Tumlin. (Avard, Carol)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Sandra Gayle Tumlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tumlin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Gayle Tumlin
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?