Vive Health LLC v. Iancu
Plaintiff: Vive Health LLC
Defendant: ANDREI IANCU
Case Number: 2:2019cv00513
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sullivan, David)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion to Conduct Case Management Report Conference by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/29/2019. (brh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically to Conduct Case Management Report Conference by Vive Health LLC. (Woods, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Vive Health LLC. (Woods, Gregory)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Vive Health LLC. Related case(s): No (Woods, Gregory)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/12/2019. (WRW)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days, counsel shall file an E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Gregory S. Gewirtz, Charles P. Kennedy, and Kendall K. Gurule as counsel of record for Plaintiff Vive Health, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/2/2019. (brh)
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Gregory S. Gewirtz, appearing on behalf of Vive Health LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM013938.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Gregory Gewirtz, Charles Kennedy and Kendall Gurule to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
August 1, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kendall K. Gurule, appearing on behalf of Vive Health LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013939.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Gregory Gewirtz, Charles Kennedy and Kendall Gurule to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
August 1, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Charles P. Kennedy, appearing on behalf of Vive Health LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM013940.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Gregory Gewirtz, Charles Kennedy and Kendall Gurule to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/15/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/1/2019. (WRW)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/1/2019. (WRW) (WRW).
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Gregory Gewirtz, Charles Kennedy and Kendall Gurule to appear pro hac vice by Vive Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woods, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/25/2019. (drn)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Andrei Iancu. (drn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-513-FtM-60NPM. (SJB)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Vive Health LLC. (Woods, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Vive Health LLC. (Woods, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Appealing Trademark Trial and Appeal Board Decision against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15720994) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Woods, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vive Health LLC v. Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREI IANCU
Represented By: David P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vive Health LLC
Represented By: Gregory N. Woods
Represented By: Gregory S. Gewirtz
Represented By: Charles P. Kennedy
Represented By: Kendall K. Gurule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?