Castle Key Indemnity Company v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Castle Key Indemnity Company
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00533
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Hearing, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Amy L. Dvorak to appear pro hac vice by Castle Key Indemnity Company. (Grotefeld, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Castle Key Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Company for Castle Key Indemnity Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grotefeld, Mark) Modified on 9/9/2019 as to docket text (drn).
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/29/2019 by Castle Key Indemnity Company as to Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Grotefeld, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Castle Key Indemnity Company. Related case(s): No (Grotefeld, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Castle Key Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allstate Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Allstate Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Surety Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lincoln Benefit Life Company, Other Affiliate American Heritage Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate First Colonial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Encompass Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Encompass Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Encompass Floridian Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Esurance Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Castle Key Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allstate Life Insurance Company of New York, Other Affiliate Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Esurance Insurance Company of New Jersey, Other Affiliate Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Encompass Property and Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Encompass Independent Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Encompass Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Encompass Insurance Company of Massachusetts, Other Affiliate North Light Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ALIC Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate ALIC Reinsurance Company II, Other Affiliate Allstate Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Charter National Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Intramerica Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Encompass Insurance Company of New Jersey, Other Affiliate Encompass Property and Casualty Insurance Company of New Jersey, Other Affiliate Encompass Floridian Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Allstate North America Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allstate Texas Lloyd's for Castle Key Indemnity Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grotefeld, Mark)
August 21, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Amy L. Dvorak, appearing on behalf of Castle Key Indemnity Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM013988.). (SPB)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/22/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/8/2019. (jmc)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/8/2019. (jmc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/31/2019. (drn)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Home Depot USA, Inc.. (drn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-533-FtM-60MRM. (SJB)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home Depot USA, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15745772) filed by Castle Key Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Grotefeld, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castle Key Indemnity Company v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castle Key Indemnity Company
Represented By: Mark S. Grotefeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?