Kimberly Regenesis, LLC, et al v. Lee County, a Florida political subdivision
Plaintiff: DAMASCUS TRADING COMPANY, LLC and KIMBERLY REGENESIS, LLC
Defendant: LEE COUNTY, a Florida political subdivision and Lee County
Case Number: 2:2019cv00538
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim; and, Motion to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Lee County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Dyson, Sacha)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Lee County. (Dyson, Sacha) **Note: Please refer to Doc #20 for Motion filed with Exhibits attached. Modified on 9/24/2019 (MLJ).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. For good cause shown and because the motion is unopposed, Defendant shall respond to the Complaint #1 on or before September 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/16/2019. (HAP)
September 14, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the #1 Complaint by Lee County. (Dyson, Sacha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Lee County. (Dyson, Sacha)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including September 16, 2019 to respond to the Complaint #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/28/2019. (HAP)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice CORRECTED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF RELATED CASES per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Damascus Trading Company, LLC, Kimberly Regenesis, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Green, James)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lee County. Related case(s): Yes (Dyson, Sacha)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Lee County. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/10/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/27/2019. (drn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to The Complaint by Lee County. (Dyson, Sacha)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Hearing on behalf of Lee County (Hearing, Gregory)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #5 Related Case Order by Damascus Trading Company, LLC, Kimberly Regenesis, LLC. Related case(s): no (Green, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Damascus Trading Company, LLC, Kimberly Regenesis, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kimberly Regenesis for Damascus Trading Company, LLC, Kimberly Regenesis, LLC.. (Green, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 08/05/2019 by Kimberly Regenesis, LLC as to Lee County. (Green, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/21/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/7/2019. (WRW)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND ADA TITLE III NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/7/2019. (WRW)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/1/2019. (MLJ)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Lee County. (MLJ)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-538-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEE COUNTY, a Florida political subdivision (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15753204) filed by Kimberly Regenesis, LLC, DAMASCUS TRADING COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Green, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimberly Regenesis, LLC, et al v. Lee County, a Florida political subdivision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAMASCUS TRADING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: James K. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY REGENESIS, LLC
Represented By: James K. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE COUNTY, a Florida political subdivision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Represented By: Sacha Dyson
Represented By: Julia Corbin Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?