Batson v. Ave Maria University
Plaintiff: Robert J Batson
Defendant: Ave Maria University
Case Number: 2:2019cv00543
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ave Maria University. Related case(s): no (Campbell, Julie)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #16 Interested persons order by Ave Maria University. (Campbell, Julie)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/29/2019. (jmc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 10:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 10/14/2019. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Ave Maria University. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/11/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/28/2019. (drn)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Ave Maria University Designation of Trial Counsel (Campbell, Julie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ave Maria University.(Campbell, Julie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 8/9/19 as to Ave Maria University by Robert J Batson (Noonan, Geralyn) Modified on 8/26/2019 as to filing event (drn).
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert J Batson. Related case(s): n (Noonan, Geralyn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Robert J Batson. (Noonan, Geralyn)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER striking #8 and #9 the Notices of Unavailability filed by Geralyn Farrell Noonan. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike the documents and to add appropriate notations to the related docket text stating that the documents are stricken by this Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/14/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Robert J Batson from 9/26/2019 to 9/30/2019. (Noonan, Geralyn) Modified on 8/15/2019. Stricken per Order #10 (drn).
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Robert J Batson from 8/17/2019 to 8/27/2019. (Noonan, Geralyn) Modified on 8/15/2019. Stricken per Order #10 (drn).
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/19/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/5/2019. (jmc)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/5/2019. (jmc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/5/2019. (drn)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Ave Maria University. (drn)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Robert J Batson. (Noonan, Geralyn)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-543-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ave Maria University with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15757200) filed by Robert J Batson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Noonan, Geralyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batson v. Ave Maria University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Batson
Represented By: Geralyn Farrell Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ave Maria University
Represented By: Julie A. Campbell
Represented By: Kevin Wayne Crews
Represented By: Michael C. Shue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?