Brawley v. Bugs-Or-Us Pest Elimination Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Whitney Brawley
Defendant: Barry Cohen, Bugs-Or-Us Pest Elimination Service, Inc. and John R Carlton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00544
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Interested persons order by Bugs-Or-Us Pest Elimination Service, Inc.. (Getty, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bugs-Or-Us Pest Elimination Service, Inc., John R Carlton, Barry Cohen. Related case(s): y (Fowler-Hermes, Jennifer)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/10/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/27/2019. (laf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Bugs-Or-Us Pest Elimination Service, Inc., John R Carlton, Barry Cohen.(Getty, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF of service as to Barry Cohen on 8/9/19 by Whitney Brawley (Noonan, Geralyn) Modified on 8/26/2019 as to docket text (mls).
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF of service as to John R. Carlton on 8/5/19 by Whitney Brawley (Noonan, Geralyn) Modified on 8/26/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF of service of Bugs-or-Us Pest Elimination Service, Inc. on 8/5/19 by Whitney Brawley (Noonan, Geralyn) Modified on 8/26/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Whitney Brawley. (Noonan, Geralyn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Whitney Brawley. Related case(s): n (Noonan, Geralyn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Whitney Brawley from 9/26/2019 to 9/30/2019. (Noonan, Geralyn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Whitney Brawley from 8/17/2019 to 8/27/2019. (Noonan, Geralyn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/26/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/12/2019. (WRW)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/12/2019. (WRW)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (MLS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued to Barry Cohen by Whitney Brawley. (Noonan, Geralyn) Modified on 8/2/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued to John Carlton by Whitney Brawley. (Noonan, Geralyn) Modified on 8/2/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued to Bugs-Or-Us Pest Elimination by Whitney Brawley. (Noonan, Geralyn) Modified on 8/2/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/2/2019. (MLS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-544-FtM-60NPM. (SJB)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15758004) filed by Whitney Brawley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noonan, Geralyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brawley v. Bugs-Or-Us Pest Elimination Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Cohen
Represented By: Jennifer M. Fowler-Hermes
Represented By: John Christopher Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bugs-Or-Us Pest Elimination Service, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Fowler-Hermes
Represented By: John Christopher Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Carlton
Represented By: Jennifer M. Fowler-Hermes
Represented By: John Christopher Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Brawley
Represented By: Geralyn Farrell Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?