Wotitzky v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Hal Frank Wotitzky
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00561
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-5336, filed on 8/26/2019. (LMF)
August 23, 2019 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California. (laf)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741. (drn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 8/9/109 as to Monsanto Company by Hal Frank Wotitzky (Draper, Mark) Modified on 8/12/2019 as to docket text (drn).
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hal Frank Wotitzky. Related case(s): yes (Draper, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order for Civil Cases by Hal Frank Wotitzky. (Draper, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/23/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/9/2019. (jmc)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/9/2019. (jmc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Hal Frank Wotitzky. (drn)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hal Frank Wotitzky. (Draper, Mark)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number Information emailed to MDL Panel on 8/8/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (drn)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/8/2019. (drn)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-561-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15780041) filed by Hal F Wotitzky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Monsanto)(Draper, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wotitzky v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal Frank Wotitzky
Represented By: Mark A. Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?