Valerio v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Joseph G. Valerio
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00585
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (MLS).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice (Doc. #8) filed on August 30, 2019. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) allows a plaintiff to dismiss an action voluntarily before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. The dismissal is effective upon filing and requires no further action by the Court. See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, in compliance with Rule 41(a), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate all pending motions and deadlines, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/3/2019. (KRH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Joseph G. Valerio (Petosa, Frank)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/9/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2019. (WRW)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/26/2019. (WRW)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2741, Information emailed to MDL Panel on 8/19/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (MLS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/19/2019. (MLS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (MLS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-585-FtM-38NPM. (NAS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15819372) filed by Joseph G. Valerio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Petosa, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valerio v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph G. Valerio
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Represented By: Mike Morgan
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?