Withrow v. Collecto, Inc.
Plaintiff: Candice Withrow
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00619
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #18 Reply to Response in Opposition to the Amended Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses regarding the Answer to Complaint by Candice Withrow (Kim, Young)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to #17 Response in Opposition to #14 the Amended Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses re #7 Answer to Complaint filed by Candice Withrow. (Kim, Young)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to #14 Amended Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses re #7 Answer to Complaint filed by Collecto, Inc. (McHale, Charles)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Endorsed Order granting #15 Unopposed Motion to Allow Telephonic Appearance at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/25/2019. (brh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the case management conference by Collecto, Inc. (McHale, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 Amended MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses re #7 Answer to Complaint by Candice Withrow. (Kim, Young) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #12 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/20/2019. (brh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses re #7 Answer to Complaint by Candice Withrow. (Kim, Young) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Candice Withrow. (Kim, Young)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Candice Withrow. Related case(s): no (Kim, Young)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Collecto, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EOS HOldings GmbH for Collecto, Inc... (McHale, Charles)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Collecto, Inc.. Related case(s): no (McHale, Charles)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Collecto, Inc..(McHale, Charles)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/24/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/10/2019. (WRW)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/10/2019. (WRW)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/27/2019. (RMT)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Collecto, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Candice Withrow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RMT)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-619-FtM-60NPM. (SJB)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court Lee County, case number 19-SC-005422 filed in State Court on 07/23/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15847065 filed by Collecto, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Summons, #5 State Court Other Documents Notice of Removal)(McHale, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Withrow v. Collecto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Represented By: Charles James McHale, Jr.
Represented By: Dale Thomas Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Withrow
Represented By: Young Vincent Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?