Azarko v. Azar
Plaintiff: Nonna Azarko
Defendant: Alex Azar
Interested Party: United States Attorney Office for the Middle District of Florida
Case Number: 2:2019cv00650
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:2005
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/14/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/31/2019. (RMT)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Sullivan on behalf of Alex Azar, United States Attorney Office for the Middle District of Florida (Sullivan, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Nonna Azarko (Nelson, Terry)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Nonna Azarko from November 1, 2019 to November 8, 2019. (Nelson, Terry)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Nonna Azarko from October 19, 2020 to November 11, 2020. (Nelson, Terry)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Nonna Azarko. (Nelson, Terry)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases none per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nonna Azarko. Related case(s): no (Nelson, Terry)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/3/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/19/2019. (WRW)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/19/2019. (WRW)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF of service by Nonna Azarko (Nelson, Terry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/9/2019. (MLJ)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Alex Azar, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MLS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Azar Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number FtM014041 filed by Nonna Azarko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C1, #6 Exhibit C2, #7 Exhibit C3, #8 Exhibit C4, #9 Exhibit C5, #10 Exhibit C6, #11 Exhibit C7, #12 Exhibit C8, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(MLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azarko v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Attorney Office for the Middle District of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nonna Azarko
Represented By: Terry S. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?