GSD Construction Services, LLC v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: GSD Construction Services, LLC a/a/o James D. Craig and GSD Construction Services, LLC
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00672
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Trial term commencing 5/3/2021 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/7/2019. (MLJ)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2019. (Digital) (MLJ)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Additional Attorney Appearance by Aileen N. Falcon on behalf of GSD Construction Services, LLC (Falcon, Aileen)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference. A party may appear telephonically or in person on November 7, 2019 at 10:45 AM. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 19672. Parties appearing by telephone are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/25/2019. (HAP)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Whittle, Shirley)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Whittle, Shirley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Whittle, Shirley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent GSD Construction Services, LLC, Other Affiliate James Craig, Other Affiliate Robin Craig, Other Affiliate HL Law Group, P.A., Other Affiliate Shirley W. Whittle, Other Affiliate Whittle Law, P.A., Other Affiliate Harold Y. Levy, Other Affiliate Dairon Montes de Oca, Other Affiliate Joseph Piagentini for Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company.. (Whittle, Shirley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company.(Whittle, Shirley)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by GSD Construction Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent GSD Construction Services, LLC, Other Affiliate John Schmitz, Other Affiliate HL Law Group, P.A., Other Affiliate Donan Engineering Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Shirley W. Whittle, Other Affiliate Whittle Law, P.A., Other Affiliate Harold Y. Levy, Other Affiliate Dairon Montes de Oca, Other Affiliate James D Craig, Other Affiliate Austen Denten for GSD Construction Services, LLC.. (Montes de Oca, Dairon)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by GSD Construction Services, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Montes de Oca, Dairon)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dairon Montes de Oca on behalf of GSD Construction Services, LLC (Montes de Oca, Dairon)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 10:45 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 4 E before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/8/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/24/2019. (WRW)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/8/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/24/2019. (WRW)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant shall have up to and including October 4, 2019, to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/20/2019. (brh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Complaint by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Whittle, Shirley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/13/2019. (drn)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by GSD Construction Services, LLC in State Court 7/15/19.(drn)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-672-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Circuit Court, case number 19-CA-004540 filed in State Court on 07/15/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15912829 filed by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2. Exhibit 1 to Petition - Complaint (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 2. Exhibit 2 to Petition - Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit 2. Exhibit 3 to Petition - Notice of Filing State Court Records, #4 Exhibit 2. Exhibit 4 to Petition - Sunbiz - GSD, #5 Exhibit 2. Exhibit 4 to Petition - 2019 Annual Report - GSD, #6 Exhibit 2. Exhibit 5 to Petition - Public Records, #7 Exhibit 2. Exhibit 6 to Petition - Dec Pages, #8 Exhibit 2. Exhibit 7 to Petition - GSD Estimate, #9 State Court COMPLAINT 3. Complaint, #10 Exhibit 3. Exhibit A to Compalint, #11 Exhibit 3. Exhibit B to Compalint, #12 State Court Docket Sheet 4. State Court Docket, #13 State Court Other Documents 5. Civil Cover Sheet - State Court, #14 State Court Other Documents 6. Summons, #15 State Court Other Documents 7. Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, #16 State Court Other Documents 8. Plaintiff's Request for Production, #17 State Court Other Documents 9. Plaintiff's Request for Interrogatories, #18 State Court Other Documents 10. Plaintiff's Notice of Request for Depositions, #19 State Court Other Documents 11. Standing Order, #20 State Court Other Documents 12. Order of Reassignment, #21 State Court Other Documents 13. Metropolitan's Email Designation, #22 State Court Other Documents 14. Metropolitan's notice of Appearance, #23 State Court Other Documents 15. Metropolitan's Notice to the State Court of Removal, #24 Civil Cover Sheet 16. Civil Cover Sheet)(Whittle, Shirley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GSD Construction Services, LLC v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GSD Construction Services, LLC a/a/o James D. Craig
Represented By: Harold Y. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GSD Construction Services, LLC
Represented By: Harold Y. Levy
Represented By: Aileen N. Falcon
Represented By: Dairon Montes de Oca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Shirley W. Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?