United States of America v. $126,880 In U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $126,880 In U.S. Currency
Claimant: Lorenzo Brown and Quenita Mara Harris
Case Number: 2:2019cv00728
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: Official Government Internet Site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication 30 consecutive days from October 16, 2019 through November 14, 2019. (Muench, James)
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to stay discovery MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS filed by United States of America. (Muench, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to stay discovery MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Lorenzo Brown, Quenita Mara Harris. (Grogoza, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #17 Objection Statements of Right or Interest by United States of America. (Muench, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF RIGHT OR INTEREST re #16 MOTION for leave to file Reply by Lorenzo Brown, Quenita Mara Harris. (Grogoza, Stephen) Modified on 11/7/2019 as to docket text (drn).
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to file Reply to #15 Response in Opposition re #14 Motion to Strike the Motion to Dismiss verified complaint by United States of America. (Muench, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition #14 Motion to Strike #13 Motion to Dismiss verified complaint for failure to state a claim filed by Lorenzo Brown, Quenita Mara Harris. (Grogoza, Stephen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #13 Motion to Dismiss verified complaint for failure to state a claim by United States of America. (Muench, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss verified complaint for failure to state a claim by Claimants, Quenita Mara Harris and Lorenzo Brown. (Grogoza, Stephen)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem, the Clerk is directed to issue a Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the Defendant Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/15/2019. (MLJ)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Muench, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by United States of America. (Muench, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): No (Muench, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/24/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/10/2019. (jmc)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/10/2019. (jmc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/9/2019. (MLJ)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSFER IN from Tampa Division on 10/07/2019 Case Number 8:19-cv-2444. Case assigned to District Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-728-FtM-60MRM. (MLJ)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting the United States of America's motion to transfer. (Doc. #2). The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Fort Myers Division of the Middle District of Florida and, thereafter, close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/7/2019. (DMD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to transfer case to the Fort Myers Division by United States of America. (Muench, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $126,880 In U.S. Currency filed by United States of America.(WCD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $126,880 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $126,880 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James A. Muench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lorenzo Brown
Represented By: Stephen M. Grogoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Quenita Mara Harris
Represented By: Stephen M. Grogoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?