Brown v. Fort Myers Reef Acquisitions, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: L. Yvonne Brown
Defendant: Coastal Ridge Management, LLC, Stacy Hess, Carmine Marceno and Fort Myers Reef Acquisitions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00739
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/2/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION and ORDER denying plaintiff's #8 motion for temporary restraining order. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/8/2019. (CMG)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of L. Yvonne Brown in support of #8 Second Motion for temporary restraining order by L. Yvonne Brown. (MLJ)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for temporary restraining order by L. Yvonne Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 & A-2, #2 Exhibit B)(MLJ)
October 31, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable - unable to forward, re: #6 Standing Order and re: 25 pages, #7 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Mail not resent to L. Yvonne Brown. (MLJ)
October 22, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable - return to sender/unable to forward, re: #6 Standing Order. Mail resent to L. Yvonne Brown re: #6 Standing Order, and #7 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (MLJ)
October 21, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable - return to sender/unable to forward, re: #7 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Mail not resent to L. Yvonne Brown. (MLJ)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER denying #3 Motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/15/2019. (RKR)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/10/2019. (MLJ)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by L. Yvonne Brown. (RMT)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of L. Yvonne Brown re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order by L. Yvonne Brown. (RMT)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for temporary restraining order by L. Yvonne Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(RMT)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by L. Yvonne Brown. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coastal Ridge Management, LLC, Fort Myers Reef Acquisitions, LLC, Stacy Hess, Carmine Marceno filed by L. Yvonne Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Fort Myers Reef Acquisitions, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Ridge Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmine Marceno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Myers Reef Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Yvonne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?