Johnson, et al v. Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Tavaris McCarter, Tykwan Johnson and Tykwan Wright
Defendant: Dayna Johnson, Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding Inc. and David Johnson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00741
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/27/2019. (SMG)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER AND FLSA TRACK TWO NOTICE. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/21/2019. (MLJ)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically or In-Person. An FLSA Scheduling Order will be entered in this case, which renders premature any requirement for the parties to meet to prepare a case management report. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to retrack this case to FLSA Tract Two, which will supersede the previous Track Two notice #7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/20/2019. (brh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by David Johnson, Dayna Johnson, Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding Inc.. (Blanchfield, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to meet in-person or by telephone for their Case Management Conference and to file the Case Management Report by Tykwan Johnson, Tavaris McCarter. (Murthy, Angeli) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order Amended by Tykwan Johnson, Tavaris McCarter. (Murthy, Angeli)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice, #8 Interested persons order by Tykwan Johnson, Tavaris McCarter. (Murthy, Angeli)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 10/16/2019 by Tykwan Johnson, Tavaris McCarter as to Dayna Johnson. (Murthy, Angeli)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 10/16/2019 by Tykwan Johnson, Tavaris McCarter as to David Johnson. (Murthy, Angeli)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 10/16/2019 by Tykwan Johnson, Tavaris McCarter as to Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding Inc.. (Murthy, Angeli)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding, Inc., David Johnson and Dayna Johnson. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/20/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/6/2019. (drn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by David Johnson, Dayna Johnson, Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding Inc..(Blanchfield, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tykwan Johnson, Tavaris McCarter. Related case(s): no (Murthy, Angeli)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Tykwan Johnson, Tavaris McCarter. (Murthy, Angeli)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/4/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/21/2019. (WRW)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/21/2019. (WRW)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/11/2019. (MLJ)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Dayna Johnson. (MLJ)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to David Johnson. (MLJ)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding Inc. (MLJ)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-741-FtM-60NPM. (SJB)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Johnson, Dayna Johnson, Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16018222) filed by Tykwan Johnson, Tavaris McCarter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons David Johnson, #3 Proposed Summons Dayna Johnson, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murthy, Angeli)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, et al v. Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tavaris McCarter
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tykwan Johnson
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tykwan Wright
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayna Johnson
Represented By: Robert E. Blanchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson's Tree Service and Stump Grinding Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Blanchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Johnson
Represented By: Robert E. Blanchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?