Advanced Screenworks, LLC v. Mosher et al
Plaintiff: Advanced Screenworks, LLC
Defendant: GOLD STAR VENTURES LLC, Paul C. Mosher and Gold Star Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00758
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #19 Interested persons order by Paul C. Mosher. (Johnson, Mark)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gold Star Ventures, LLC. Related case(s): no (Johnson, Mark)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Paul C. Mosher. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/24/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/10/2019. (drn)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Paul C. Mosher. (Johnson, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 11/22/19 by Advanced Screenworks, LLC as to Gold Star Ventures, LLC (Dixit, Shyam) Modified on 12/3/2019 as to docket text and filing event (drn).
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 11/22/19 by Advanced Screenworks, LLC as to Paul C. Mosher (Dixit, Shyam) Modified on 12/3/2019 as to filing event and docket text (drn).
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/8/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/25/2019. (jmc)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/25/2019. (jmc)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Advanced Screenworks, LLC. (Dixit, Shyam)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Advanced Screenworks, LLC. Related case(s): no (Dixit, Shyam)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of compliance re 5 Notice to counsel of Local Rule by Advanced Screenworks, LLC (Dixit, Shyam)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Patent (initial) Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLJ)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/18/2019. (MLJ)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Gold Star Ventures, LLC. (MLJ)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Paul C. Mosher. (MLJ)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Advanced Screenworks, LLC re 5 Notice to counsel of Local Rule AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet (Dixit, Shyam)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Shyam N.S. Dixit, Jr. of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLJ)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-758-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Advanced Screenworks, LLC. (Dixit, Shyam)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Advanced Screenworks, LLC. (Dixit, Shyam)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16041133) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screening Buddy, #2 Exhibit B - ASW Patent US8146647, #3 Exhibit C - ASW Assignment, #4 Exhibit D - Amazon Add, #5 Exhibit E - Paul C. Mosher ScreenClips purchase2017, #6 Exhibit F - ASW Demand Letter)(Dixit, Shyam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Screenworks, LLC v. Mosher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Screenworks, LLC
Represented By: Shyam N.S. Dixit, Jr
Represented By: Robert Leslie Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLD STAR VENTURES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul C. Mosher
Represented By: Mark Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Star Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Mark Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?